MA H13 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 9) as relates to wages. Public Service.
Title
Relative to wages
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2021 from 09:30 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1964 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H591 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1237 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1232 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1199 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H591 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1237 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1232 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1199 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H13 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H13.pdf |