MA H130 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4021
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - New draft substituted, see H4021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - New draft substituted, see H4021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the renaming of certain mental retardation facilities, departments and references. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Renaming certain facilities, departments, and references in law and regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | New draft substituted, see H4021 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4021 |
2015-10-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4021 (Replaced by) 2016-07-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4532
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H130.pdf |