MA H1303 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sex offenders. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to sex offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1303.pdf |