MA H131 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a permanent commission on the social status of men and boys of color. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a permanent commission on the social status of men and boys of color
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4024 |
2019-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H168 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4024
H4024 (Replaced by) 2019-08-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4024 (Replaced by) 2019-08-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H131 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H131.pdf |