MA H1315 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to chronic disease care self-management. Health Care Financing.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to chronic disease care self-management
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5201 |
2021-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1315 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1315.pdf |