MA H1321 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public housing. Housing.
Title
Restoring the commonwealths public housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S792 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1212 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S792 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1212 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1321 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1321.pdf |