MA H1324 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4941
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to foreclosures and vacant properties. Housing.
Title
To minimize foreclosures and their harm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4941 |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3307 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S931 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
H1767 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1482 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4941 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S931 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
H1767 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1482 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4941 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1324 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1324.pdf |