MA H1365 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appropriation and expenditure of community preservation funds for community housing purposes in the town of Chatham. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Facilitating the appropriation and expenditure of community preservation funds for community housing purposes in the town of Chatham
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-12-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H2972 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S546 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4042 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2024
S2875 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - See H4042
S546 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4042 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2024
S2875 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - See H4042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1365 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1365.pdf |