MA H1367 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Vargas of Haverhill and Tyler of Boston, a petition of Andres X. Vargas, Chynah Tyler and others that graduating high school students be required to complete applications for federal and state higher education financial aid. Higher Education.
Title
To facilitate additional financial student assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S840 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S843 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S351 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S843 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S351 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1367 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1367.pdf |