MA H1374 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Sousa of Framingham, a petition of Priscila S. Sousa, Danielle W. Gregoire and James C. Arena-DeRosa that the the Department of Housing and Community Development administer residential assistance for families in transition homelessness prevention programs. Housing.
Title
Relative to residential assistance for families in transition (RAFT)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1374.pdf |