MA H1378 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to notices to notaries public and justices of the peace prior to the expiration of their commissions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to justices of the peace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1386 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S831 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S833 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2064 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
H1386 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S831 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S833 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2064 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1378 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1378.pdf |