MA H1383 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the comprehensive permit law. Housing.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission to study and make recommendations relative to Chapter 40B
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] | Rep. Richard Haggerty [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1383.pdf |