MA H1399 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to cancer presumption for police officers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cancer presumption for police officers
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2077 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2271
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2077 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2271
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1399.pdf |