MA H141 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4470
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to continuously monitoring the entrances, exits, and common areas of all facilities operated under the authority of the Department of Mental Health and the Department of Developmental Services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to ensuring the safety of residents of facilities under the authority of the Department of Mental Health and the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4470 |
2014-06-16 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2014-05-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4470 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H141 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H141.pdf |