MA H141 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to home improvement contractors furnishing performance and payment bonds. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to partial payments
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H141.pdf |