MA H1410 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipal governing bodies to revoke the application of civil service laws to certain positions within said municipalities. Public Service.
Title
Relative to civil service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2086 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2018
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-12-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2579 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 250 of the Acts of 2018
H4704 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
S2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2018
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-12-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2579 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 250 of the Acts of 2018
H4704 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1410 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1410.pdf |