MA H142 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a system for tracking the unmet service needs of persons with developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating a means for tracking the unmet need of individuals with developmental disabilities in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4496 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H100 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4496 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H100 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4496 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H142 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H142.pdf |