MA H1428 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of the days or hours worked by certain retired employees. Public Service.
Title
To report retiree post earnings consistent with MGL 32 section 91
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1322 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2529 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2584 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1322 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2529 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2584 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1428.pdf |