MA H1432 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S84
Note: Legislation replaced by H4622
Note: Legislation replaced by H4622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an interagency child abuse and neglect prevention task force. The Judiciary.
Title
To establish an interagency child abuse and neglect prevention task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4622 |
2016-05-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied by S84 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-04-15 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S84 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1432
H4622 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4622 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1432 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1432.pdf |