MA H1460 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Whelan of Brewster, a petition of Timothy R. Whelan and others that certain employees of the Massachusetts Port Authority be included in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Mass Port police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-03-05 | House | Accompanied by S1434 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H1460
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1525 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1424 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H1460
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1525 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1424 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1460 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1460.pdf |