MA H1461 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-28 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-28 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of certain tickets by municipal officers and inspectors. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Amending the municipal ticket law
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-28 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-01-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1461 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9991&generalCourtId=1 |