MA H1471 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require criminal offender record information for persons volunteering at organizations conducting activities and programs for children. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to criminal background checks for youth program volunteers
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Brian Joyce [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4218 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1471 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1471.pdf |