MA H1477 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit nurse practitioners to endorse certain documents requiring the signature of a physician. Public Health.
Title
To streamline health care services by allowing nurse practitioners to verify medical papers and records
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Sen. Susan Fargo [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
Rep. Stephen Smith [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3614 |
2011-04-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3614 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1477 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10623&generalCourtId=1 |