MA H1488 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care facilities licensed by the Department of Public Health to file reports of certain blood transfusions and incidents of lung injuries. Public Health.
Title
Relative to a Transfusion Related Acute Lung Injury registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-08-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1488 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12824&generalCourtId=1 |