MA H15 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4189
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission to hold hearings So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 13) as relates to authorizing said commission to hold hearings. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission to hold hearings
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4189 |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4189 (Replaced by) 2014-11-20 - Reported, in part, by H3638
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H15 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H15.pdf |