MA H1510 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4210
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the estate tax code of the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts estate tax code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4210 |
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H1580 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
H1581 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H4210 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H1613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H1580 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
H1581 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H4210 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - see H2623
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1510.pdf |