MA H1516 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Reinstein of Revere, a petition of Kathi-Anne Reinstein and others that ambulatory surgery centers and clinical laboratories be required to provide care to enrollees of MassHealth. Public Health.
Title
Requiring ambulatory surgicenters and clinical laboratories to serve MassHealth enrollees
Sponsors
Rep. Kathi-Anne Reinstein [D] | Rep. Demetruis Atsalis [D] | Sen. Katherine Clark [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4154 |
2011-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4154 (Replaced by)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1516 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12961&generalCourtId=1 |