MA H153 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to granting provisional social worker licenses under an alternative method of examining competency. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide for the alternative method of examining competency
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5088 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H153.pdf |