MA H1551 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the awarding of attorney’s fees, staff time, costs and expenses in code enforcement matters. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the award of attorney’s fees, staff time, costs and expenses in code enforcement matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1551 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1551.pdf |