MA H1559 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposition of the personal property of tenants in actions for possession of land or tenements. The Judiciary.
Title
Preventing foreclosures by reducing administrative costs for small business property owners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1557 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2526 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2526 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1559 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1559.pdf |