MA H156 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4068
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to funding health and human service programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To reinvest savings for the financial health of the human service system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4068 |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4068 (Replaced by) 2014-06-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H156 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H156.pdf |