MA H157 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of personal identity. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
In protection of personal identity
Sponsors
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Roselee Vincent [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4648 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H188 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1337 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4384 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4648 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1337 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4384 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4648 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H157.pdf |