MA H1593 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. D'Emilia of Bridgewater, a petition of Angelo L. D'Emilia and Christopher D. Delmonte authorizing the State Retirement Board to pay a certain retirement benefit to Virginia Wise the surviving spouse of Raymond Wise an officer of the Bridgewater State College police department. Public Service.
Title
Directing the State Board of Retirement to grant certain retirement benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 21, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1593 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11246&generalCourtId=1 |