MA H1604 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to family and medical leave. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the small necessities leave act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1683 (Similar To) 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1604.pdf |