MA H1622 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an income tax credit for qualified tuition and fees for higher education. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tuition tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S672 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
S681 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S672 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
S681 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1622 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1622.pdf |