MA H1639 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing reimbursements to towns for nonprofits exempt from property taxes. Revenue.
Title
Allowing PILOT payments to municipalities
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1539 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S225 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S233 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H248 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S260
H2362 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H313 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S225 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S233 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H248 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S260
H2362 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H313 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1639 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1639.pdf |