MA H1672 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an income tax credit for expenditures for the design, construction, repair or replacement of failed cesspool or septic systems. Revenue.
Title
Relative to expanding the septic system tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-20 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1672 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7888&generalCourtId=1 |