MA H1679 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of false identification for the purpose of purchasing alcohol. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the use of false identification for the purpose of purchasing alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1779 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1780 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1781 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H1782 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1783 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1779 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1780 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1781 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H1782 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1783 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1679 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1679.pdf |