MA H168 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3504
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand access to healthy foods through improved nutritional products at corner stores and farmers markets. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To expand access to healthy foods and create the Massachusetts Food Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3504 |
2013-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H3504 (Replaced by) 2013-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H168 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H168.pdf |