MA H1682 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to empowering law enforcement to cooperate with the United States to transfer custody of certain convicted criminals. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to federal and local law enforcement cooperation
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1682 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1682.pdf |