MA H169 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preventing funds deposited in children’s savings accounts from counting against cash assistance benefits. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Preventing funds deposited in children’s savings accounts from counting against cash assistance benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1628 (Similar To) 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
S26 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S26 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H169 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H169.pdf |