MA H1692 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to damages from eminent domain takings for private investment. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the defense of private property rights through the prevention of abusive eminent domain takings in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1688 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S969 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
S1082 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1056 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H82 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S969 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
S1082 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1056 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H82 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1692 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1692.pdf |