MA H170 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5022
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the legal age for marijuana consumption and purchase from 21 to 25 years of age. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Increasing the legal age for marijuana consumption and purchase from 21 to 25
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5022 |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H5022 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H170.pdf |