MA H1701 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit the time that former employees must wait before being employed by a competitor. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the judicial enforcement of noncompetition agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4323 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, May 16, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4323 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4434
H839 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2870 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1271 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1272 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H659 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied S457
H839 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2870 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1271 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1272 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H659 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied S457
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1701 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1701.pdf |