MA H171 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-01 - Accompanying a new draft, see S1994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-01 - Accompanying a new draft, see S1994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to including personal financial literacy in the math curriculum for all school grade levels. Education.
Title
Establishing a financial literacy curriculum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-01 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S1994 |
2011-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H171 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8375&generalCourtId=1 |