MA H1714 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit executive salaries of state funded nonprofit organizations and public charities. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Limiting executive salaries of state funded nonprofit organizations and public charities
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2013-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2013 from 12:30 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2014-06-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1714 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1714.pdf |