MA H1716 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S874
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Accompanied S874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Accompanied S874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to apprenticeship programs. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to apprenticeship programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied S874 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Accompanied S874 |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S874 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1716 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1716.pdf |