MA H1727 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S891
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied S891
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied S891
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit indemnity and insurance responsibility for general contractors and subcontractors in construction work. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To limit indemnity and insurance responsibility for general contractors and subcontractors in construction work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied S891 |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Cary Hall |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S891 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1727 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1727.pdf |