MA H1727 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Department of Public Health substance abuse evaluation reports. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to the report on substance abuse evaluations
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] |
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4450 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1727 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1727.pdf |