MA H1757 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the minimum wage and link future increases to the Consumer Price Index. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Promoting the Commonwealth's economic recovery with a strong minimum wage
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4446 |
2014-04-22 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday May 01, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4446 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1757 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1757.pdf |